EP2077619 - System for providing a complementary metal-oxide semiconductor (CMOS) emitter coupled logic (ECL) equivalent input/output (I/O) circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loukusa, Jeffrey D. 6545 Park Trail Road Hamel, MN 55340 / US | 02 /
Abdelli, Sald E. 5615 Fremont Avenue South Minneapolis, MN 55419 / US | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2009/28] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08168430.0 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | US20080970327 | 07.01.2008 Original published format: US 970327 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2077619 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2077619 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077619 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00, H03K19/0175, H03K19/0185 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
H03K19/017509 (EP,US);
H03K19/018528 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | H03K19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2012/50] |
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zur Bereitstellung einer CMOS-ECL-Äquivalent-E/A-Schaltung | [2009/28] | English: | System for providing a complementary metal-oxide semiconductor (CMOS) emitter coupled logic (ECL) equivalent input/output (I/O) circuit | [2009/28] | French: | Système pour la fourniture d'un circuit d'entrée/sorties équivalente de logique couplée à l'émetteur semi-conducteur d'oxyde métallique complémentaire (CMOS) | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5166558 (OHSAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - line 63 * * column 2, line 1 - line 13 * * column 2, line 31 - line 34 * * column 2, line 49 - line 53 * * column 4, line 37 - line 68 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 7 * * column 7, line 13 - line 18 * [A] 6 [Y] 2,5,8-10; | [XA]JPH04286419 (NIPPON ELECTRIC ENG) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 3-5; | [IA]EP0380152 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 12 - line 28 * * column 4, line 16 - line 26 * * column 5, line 41 - line 47 * * column 8, line 7 - line 15 * [A] 3,4; | [Y]US4968905 (SANWO IKUO J [US], et al) [Y] 2,5 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - line 35 *; | [Y]US6320413 (KURISU MASAKAZU [JP]) [Y] 8-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6563342 (FULKERSON DAVID E [US]) [A] 1,3,7 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - line 44 * |