EP2063389 - Correction of chromatic aberration and distortion in images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/22] | Image pickup apparatus | ||
[2011/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/37] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasahara, Ryosuke c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2011/37] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Kasahara, Ryosuke c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 1-3-6, Nakamagome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08168825.1 | 11.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | JP20070304417 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007304417 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063389 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063389 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T3/00, G06T5/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G06T5/80 (EP,US);
H04N25/61 (EP);
H04N25/611 (EP);
H04N25/615 (EP,US);
H04N25/6153 (EP,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/05] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Korrektur der chromatischen Aberration und Verzerrung in Bildern | [2011/22] | English: | Correction of chromatic aberration and distortion in images | [2011/22] | French: | Correction de l'aberration chromatique et de la distorsion dans les images | [2011/22] |
Former [2009/22] | Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/22] | Image pickup apparatus | ||
Former [2009/22] | Appareil de capture d'images | Examination procedure | 30.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 28.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6747702 (HARRIGAN MICHAEL E [US]); | [Y]US6762792 (MATSUMURA HIDEKI [JP]); | [A]US2004202380 (KOHLER THORSTEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US6903733 (GREENBERG ROBERT Y [US], et al); | [Y]US2005213159 (OKADA SEIJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US7142238 (SAWADA KENICHI [JP], et al); | [XY]US7245319 (ENOMOTO JUN [JP]) | by applicant | JP2007304417 |