EP2186500 - Safety device for hospital and care beds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joh. Stiegelmeyer GmbH & Co. KG Ackerstrasse 42 32051 Herford / DE | [2013/18] |
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Joh. Stiegelmeyer GmbH & Co. KG Ackerstrasse 42 32051 Herford / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bansmann, Martin Hillegosser Str. 145 A 33719, Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Steuernagel, Olaf Hegelstr. 8 32105, Bad Salzuflen / DE | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | Neymeyr, Ulrich Theodor Paul Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | Neymeyr, Ulrich Theodor Paul Dr. Schön & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169053.9 | 13.11.2008 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2186500 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2186500 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/05, A47C21/08 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
A61G7/0507 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/20] | Title | German: | Sicherungsvorrichtung für Kranken- und Pflegebetten | [2010/20] | English: | Safety device for hospital and care beds | [2010/20] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour lits de malades et de soins | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2008 | CY | 01.05.2013 | CZ | 01.05.2013 | DK | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | FI | 01.05.2013 | HR | 01.05.2013 | LT | 01.05.2013 | LV | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | MT | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SE | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | ES | 12.08.2013 | IS | 01.09.2013 | PT | 02.09.2013 | GB | 13.11.2013 | IE | 13.11.2013 | LU | 13.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.11.2008 | |
CY | 01.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
CZ | 01.05.2013 | ||
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
DK | 01.05.2013 | ||
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
LV | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
FI | 01.05.2013 | ||
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
HR | 01.05.2013 | ||
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 01.05.2013 | |
LT | 01.05.2013 | ||
SE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
ES | 12.08.2013 | ||
IS | 01.09.2013 | ||
PT | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 01.05.2013 | |
PT | 02.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]DE202006002334U (BURMEIER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DX] 1-10,12-15 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 11; | [Y]US3055020 (NELSON MANN STUART) [Y] 11 * figure 1 * | Examination | DE202007003808U | by applicant | EP0991344 | DE102006026028 | DE202006002334U |