EP2063358 - Telecommunications device security [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone Group PLC Group Legal (Patents), The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belrose, Caroline 22 Savernake Court Marlborough, Wiltshire SN8 4AG / GB | 02 /
Bone, Nicholas 40 Imperial Way Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4RS / GB | 03 /
Priestley, Mark c/o Vodafone Group Services Limited 1 Kingdom Street London RG14 2FN / GB | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Belrose, Caroline 22 Savernake Court Marlborough, Wiltshire SN8 4AG / GB | ||
02 /
Bone, Nicholas 40 Imperial Way Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4RS / GB | |||
03 /
Priestley, Mark c/o Faraday House The Connection Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Keston, David Arthur Vodafone Group Services Ltd. Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone House The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169068.7 | 13.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | GB20070022266 | 13.11.2007 Original published format: GB 0722266 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063358 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063358 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H04L63/105 (EP,US);
H04L12/22 (GB);
G06F21/53 (EP);
G06F21/57 (EP);
H04L63/0876 (EP);
H04W12/00 (GB);
H04W12/086 (EP,US);
H04W88/00 (GB);
H04W88/02 (EP,GB);
G06F2221/2153 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Telekommunikationsvorrichtungssicherheit | [2009/22] | English: | Telecommunications device security | [2009/22] | French: | Sécurité de dispositif de télécommunications | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 02.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Appeal following examination | 05.02.2014 | Appeal received No. T1237/14 | 02.04.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.09.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2015 | 30.11.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0046666 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]); | [X]US2002083322 (LAGOSANTO LAURENT [FR], et al); | [A]US2002087876 (LAROSE GORDON EDWARD [CA]); | [A]US2007015538 (WANG EUGENE [US]) | Examination | US2006129797 | by applicant | WO2004036513 |