EP2061145 - Dual lane control of a permanent magnet brushless motor using non-trapezoidal commutation control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strong, Ronald E. 3127 W. Quail Ave. Phoenix, AZ 85027 / US | 02 /
Wilkens, Dean R. 7991 E. Las Piedras Way Scottsdale, AZ 85262 / US | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08169198.2 | 14.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | US20070941270 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: US 941270 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061145 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/14, H02M7/48, H02P21/00 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H02P6/14 (EP,US);
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
H02P2209/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zweiwegige Steuerung eines bürstenlosen Permanentmagnet-Gleichstrommotors mit einer nicht trapezförmigen Kommutierungssteuerung | [2009/21] | English: | Dual lane control of a permanent magnet brushless motor using non-trapezoidal commutation control | [2009/21] | French: | Contrôle en double ligne d'un moteur sans balai magnétique permanent utilisant un contrôle de commutation non trapézoïdal | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 22.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10337036 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]JP2005137197 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1826899 (NSK STEERING SYS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0208] , [0245] , [0277] , [0400] , [0445]; figures 1,5,7,8,26,41,43,58 *; | [Y]US2007236186 (PATTERSON STANLEY C [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0079]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US6573672 |