EP2062650 - Centrifuge with a separator disc package and separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Mechanical Equipment GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | [2011/02] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states GEA Westfalia Separator GmbH Werner-Habig-Strasse 1 59302 Oelde / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quiter, Kathrin An der Pferdebahn 43 48317 Drensteinfurt / DE | 02 /
Bathelt, Thomas Von-Brachum-Strasse 18 59302 Oelde / DE | 03 /
Kleimann, Thomas Hindenburgstrasse 23 59302 Oelde / DE | 04 /
Penkl, Andreas Im Löttenkamp 10 59510 Lippetal / DE | 05 /
Hüllmann, Markus Schönhofstrasse 7 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 06 /
Baalmann, Klaus Kaups Esch 30 48268 Greven / DE | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169370.7 | 18.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | DE20071056575 | 23.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007056575 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062650 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2062650 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062650 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/08, B04B7/14 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
B04B1/08 (EP);
B04B7/14 (EP);
B04B2001/2066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Zentrifuge mit einem Trenntellerpaket und Trennteller | [2009/22] | English: | Centrifuge with a separator disc package and separator | [2009/22] | French: | Centrifugeuse dotée d'un paquet de disque de séparation et disque de séparation | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HR | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IE | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | MT | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | NO | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.02.2011 | |
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9627445 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH], et al) [A] 1,20* page 7, lines 6-23; figures 4,5 *; | [DA]DE102004037925 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [DA] 1-20 * paragraphs [0041] - [0045]; figures 3-6; claim 1 * | by applicant | US802150 | US1731999 | DE664383 | US2599619 | DE1909996 | DE3607526 | DE102004037925 |