EP2190113 - Method and apparatus for controlling an electrical Machine with direct torque control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2010/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kieferndorf, Frederick Steinäckerstrasse 7 CH-5442, Fislisbach / CH | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/21] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP) Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 08169416.8 | 19.11.2008 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2190113 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02P23/00, H02P21/10, H02P21/12 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
H02P21/12 (EP);
H02P21/10 (EP);
H02P21/30 (EP);
H02P23/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2011/05] |
Former [2010/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer elektrischen Maschine mit direkter Drehmomentsteuerung | [2010/21] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling an electrical Machine with direct torque control | [2010/21] | French: | Procédés et appareils de contrôle d'une machine électrique avec un contrôle direct du couple | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KAZMIERKOWSKI M P ET AL, "Improved torque and flux vector control of PWM inverter-fed induction motor drive", 19930101, (19930101), pages 115 - 120, XP006511703 [X] 1-18 * pages 117-119; figure 1 * | [X] - KADJOUDJ M; TAIBI S; GOLEA N; BENBOUZID H, "Modified direct torque control of permanent magnet synchronous motor drives", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SCIENCES AND TECHNIQUES OF AUTOMATIC CONTROL & COMPUTER ENGINEERING IJ-STA, (200712), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 167 - 180, XP002533472 [X] 1-18 * page 175; figure 1 * | [X] - BEHERA R K ET AL, "Improved direct torque control of induction motor with dither injection", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. E20084711716794, XP002533195 [X] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - SADHANA - ACADEMY PROCEEDINGS IN ENGINEERING SCIENCES OCTOBER 2008 INDIAN ACADEMY OF SCIENCES IN, (200810), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 551 - 564 [X] 1-18 * pages 555-556; figure 5 * |