EP2060864 - Method and system for drying high-moisture content plant material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL KINEMATICS CORPORATION 5050 Rickert Road Crystal Lake, IL 60014 / US | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathis, jr., Oscar L. 962 Mayfield Street Cary, IL, 60013 / US | 02 /
Wiechmann, Steve C. 729 Surrey Lane Sleepy Hollow, IL, 60118 / US | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Wegner, Hans, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/21] | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169441.6 | 19.11.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | US20070989004P | 19.11.2007 Original published format: US 989004 P | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2060864 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/10, F26B17/26 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
F26B17/26 (EP,US);
F26B17/106 (EP,US);
F26B17/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Trocknen von Pflanzenmaterial mit hohem Feuchtigkeitsgehalt | [2009/21] | English: | Method and system for drying high-moisture content plant material | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé et système pour sécher une matière végétale à haute teneur en humidité | [2009/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |