EP2072793 - Nozzle with guiding elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Deutschland Ltd & Co KG Eschenweg 11 15827 Blankenfelde-Mahlow / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rose, Marco Am Krönerstolln 63b 09599 Freiberg / DE | 02 /
Spieweg, Rene Spessartstrasse 9 14197 Berlin / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Gross, Felix, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/26] | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169540.5 | 20.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071063018 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007063018 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072793 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072793 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/48, F02K1/38 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F02K1/48 (EP,US);
F02K1/386 (EP,US);
F05D2250/13 (EP,US);
F05D2250/182 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/21] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Düse mit Leitelementen | [2009/26] | English: | Nozzle with guiding elements | [2009/26] | French: | Buse à éléments de guidage | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 15.03.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 21.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB889688 (BRISTOL SIDDELEY ENGINES LTD) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 2-19; | [XI]US3174282 (HARRISON VERNE S) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [I] 2-19; | [XI]DE2723639 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 1 * figures 1a-1b * [I] 2-19; | [XI]WO03050403 (ANDERSON JACK H [US]) [X] 1 * figures 7,8 * [I] 2-19; | [XI]US6935098 (BARDAGI THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1 * figure 11 *[I] 2-19 | Examination | DE1015270 | US3084505 | US4422524 | by applicant | US3982696 | GB2355766 |