EP2068257 - Search device, navigation device, search method and computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawauchi, Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8564 / JP | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
Kawauchi, Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD. 6-18 Harayama, Oka-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-8564 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/36] |
Former [2009/24] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08169657.7 | 21.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070317134 | 07.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007317134 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068257 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2068257 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
G06F16/242 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Suchvorrichtung, Navigationsvorrichtung, Suchverfahren und Computerprogrammprodukt | [2009/24] | English: | Search device, navigation device, search method and computer program product | [2009/24] | French: | Dispositif de recherche, dispositif de navigation, procédé de recherche et produit de programme informatique | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005222987 (VADON ERIC R [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0070] *; | [X]US2006031207 (BJARNESTAM ANNA [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0056] *; | [X]US6574624 (JOHNSON DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007125108 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH07306862 |