EP2066037 - Method of checking the operation of an analogue entry module and analogue entry module implementing this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grosjean, Dominique 30 Chemin de la Taulisse 06650 Le Rouret / FR | 02 /
Delplanque, Nicolas 173 Rue Anatole France Allée 2 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08169755.9 | 24.11.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | FR20070059314 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0759314 | [2009/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066037 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066037 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10, // H03M1/12 | [2009/41] | CPC: |
H03M1/1071 (EP);
H03M1/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | H03M1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | Funktionsüberprüfungsverfahren eines Moduls für Analogeingänge und Modul für Analogeingänge, bei dem dieses Verfahren umgesetzt wird | [2009/23] | English: | Method of checking the operation of an analogue entry module and analogue entry module implementing this method | [2009/23] | French: | Procédé de vérification du fonctionnement d'un module d'entrées analogiques et module d'entrées analogiques mettant en oeuvre ce procédé | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 29.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | HR | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | MT | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | PT | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | NO | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | LU | 24.11.2010 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
TR | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
HR | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
NO | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4580126 (KATO KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6492923 (INOUE TAKATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 47 - column 7, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005264306 (JUNG BOO-YANG [KR], et al) [A] 1-8* page 5, paragraph 75 - page 6, paragraph 81; figures 7,15 * |