EP2071608 - Slotted microchannel plate (MCP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Benjamin Ryan 785 Farm View Road Glade Hill, VA 24092 / US | 02 /
Smith, Arlynn Walter 208 Stonehaven Lane Blue Ridge, VA 24064 / US | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Management GmbH Regional Patent Office - Europe Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Esser, Wolfgang ITT Industries Management GmbH Cannonstrasse 1 71384 Weinstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 08170036.1 | 26.11.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | US20070945495 | 27.11.2007 Original published format: US 945495 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071608 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071608 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/24 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
H01J43/246 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Geschlitzte Mikrokanalplatte (MCP) | [2009/25] | English: | Slotted microchannel plate (MCP) | [2009/25] | French: | Plaque de micro-canal à fentes (MCP) | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 04.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4005323 (YATES COLIN K, et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * column 1, line 8 - column 12 * * figure 2 * [Y] 15,16 [I] 6,7,10-14; | [Y]US5686721 (SCHMIDT-BOCKING HORST [DE]) [Y] 15,16 * figure 5 *; | [XI]US5263075 (MCGANN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * figure 7b * [I] 6,7,10-14; | [A]US4070578 (TIMOTHY JOHN G, et al) [A] 15 * figure 8 *; | [A]US7199345 (MEISEL THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15 * abstract *; | [A]US5493111 (WHEELER KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15 * abstract * | by applicant | US7126263 |