EP2093975 - Communications system, nodes, and method for releasing redundant connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Teruyoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nak Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08170106.2 | 27.11.2008 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | JP20080038595 | 20.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008038595 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093975 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, // H04L29/06 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04L69/161 (EP,US);
H04L69/326 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/18] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem, Knoten und Verfahren redundante Verbindungen zu trennen | [2009/35] | English: | Communications system, nodes, and method for releasing redundant connections | [2009/35] | French: | Système de communication, noeuds et procédé pour terminer des connexions redondantes | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 26.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 07.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BERNARD ABOBA, "IPsec-NAT Compatibility Requirements; draft-aboba-nat-ipsec-04.txt", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE (IETF) DRAFT, (20010530), XP015009819 [X] 1,2,6,14 * page 3, lines 13-28 * | [T] - ALCATEL-LUCENT, "Crossing of X2 Setup Request", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-090100_SETUPPROC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE, (20090209), XP050324886 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * | Examination | - FIELDING R ET AL, "Hypertext Transfer Protocol -- HTTP/1.1; RFC 2616", INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, (19990601), XP015008399 | - Brian Totty ET AL, "Parallel Connections", HTTP: The Definitive Guide, O'Reilly Media, Inc., (20020901), ISBN 978-1-56592-509-0, XP055249511 | - NORTEL, "Text proposal for X2 Multiple SCTP association", 3GPP DRAFT; R3-080112_CR2_MULTIPLESCTPASSO_10.2.5_36.422_REV0, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080205), vol. RAN WG3, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20080205, XP050163338 |