EP2066111 - Image processing apparatus and control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuzaki, Masanori c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2,Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
Matsuzaki, Masanori c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd European Patent Department 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Canon Europe Ltd 3 The Square Stockley Park Uxbridge Middlesex UB11 1ET / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Sharp, Alan Cooper Canon Europe Ltd. European Patent Department 6 Roundwood Avenue Stockley Park Uxbridge, Middlesex UB11 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08170142.7 | 27.11.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | JP20070307895 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007307895 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066111 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2066111 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066111 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
H04N1/2307 (EP,US);
H04N1/2315 (EP,US);
H04N1/2361 (EP,US);
H04N1/32539 (EP,US);
H04N1/40006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2011/21] |
Former [2009/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren | [2009/23] | English: | Image processing apparatus and control method | [2009/23] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'image et procédé de commande | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 20.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/24] | IT | 05.06.2013 | |
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | NL | 05.06.2013 | |
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | ES | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007263237 (ROBINSON DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,8,17,18 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2007127066 (HABA KENYA [JP]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0061]; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0893753 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 45 - column 9, line 52 * | by applicant | JP2006168200 |