EP2081241 - Feedthrough for battery, method for manufacturing the same and battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/30] | Feedthrough for battery, method for manufacturing same and the battery | ||
[2012/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [2012/17] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Traulsen, Tim Am See 7 01796 Pirna / DE | 02 /
Müller, Jens-Peter Frankenstrasse 15 01309 Dresden / DE | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woehrmannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08170923.0 | 08.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | DE20081004308 | 15.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004308 | [2009/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081241 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081241 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/06, H01M2/30, H01M2/32, H01M2/34 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H01M50/186 (EP,US);
H01M50/172 (EP,US);
H01M50/191 (EP,US);
H01M50/552 (EP,US);
H01M50/571 (EP,US);
H01M50/572 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Durchführung für eine Batterie, Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben und Batterie | [2009/30] | English: | Feedthrough for battery, method for manufacturing the same and battery | [2012/04] | French: | Traversée pour une batterie, procédé pour fabriquer une telle traversée et batterie | [2012/04] |
Former [2009/30] | Feedthrough for battery, method for manufacturing same and the battery | ||
Former [2009/30] | Interface d'utilisateur pour contrôler de nombreux paramètres et procédé de contrôle de nombreux paramètres | Examination procedure | 29.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2008 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | HR | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | MT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | NO | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | LU | 08.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
LU | 08.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
MT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
HR | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NO | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | |
NO | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4598466 (ARENAS ALVARO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * column 3, line 12 - line 60 *; | [A]DE19544198 (SONNENSCHEIN ACCUMULATOREN [DE]) [A] 5,12 * column 3, line 21 - line 30 *; | [X]JP2001266813 (TDK CORP) [X] 1,3-12 * Thomson Scientific machine translation; paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * * example 4 *; | [A]US2004007748 (SAKAMA MITSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 10 * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0105] *; | [X]US2007172735 (HALL DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-12 * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0059] * * figure 6 *; | [PA]JP2008140705 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [PA] 1-12* paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * | by applicant | US4598466 | JP2001266813 | US2007172735 |