EP2101524 - Wireless communications system, wireless terminal device, indoor base station apparatus, and control apparatus for obtaining location information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2009/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinozaki, Atsushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/43] |
Former [2009/38] | 01 /
Shinozaki, Atsushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Na Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2015/43] |
Former [2009/38] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08171016.2 | 08.12.2008 | [2009/38] | Priority number, date | JP20080066197 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008066197 | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2101524 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2101524 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/22, H04W4/04, H04W84/04 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G01S5/0263 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W4/33 (US);
H04W4/90 (EP,US);
H04W76/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | H04W4/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/43] |
Former [2010/20] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drahtloses Kommunikationssystem, drahtloses Endgerät, Hausbasisstationsvorrichtung und Steuervorrichtung zum Erhalten von Standortinformationen | [2009/38] | English: | Wireless communications system, wireless terminal device, indoor base station apparatus, and control apparatus for obtaining location information | [2009/38] | French: | Système de communication sans fil, dispositif de terminal sans fil, appareil de station de base interne, et appareil de commande pour obtenir des informations de localisation | [2009/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 17.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005181805 (GALLAGHER MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1-15 * column A * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0129] * * figures 1-9B *; | [X]US7053826 (MCBURNEY PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, paragraph 1 - column 32, paragraph 15 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2007155399 (ALBERTH WILLIAM P JR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column A * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2007184845 (TRONCOSO EDMUND R [US]) [X] 1-15 * column A * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0072] * * figures 1-10 *; | [X] - AIRVANA, "Tutorial on Femtocell Technology and SIP/IMS-based Femto Network Architectures", INTERNET CITATION, (20071015), pages 1 - 68, XP002539797 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2008066197 |