EP2072239 - Tire building core segment manipulator apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Currie, William Dudley 4838 Concord Drive Stow OH 44224 / US | 02 /
Lundell, Dennis Alan 557 Northwood Drive Akron OH 44313 / US | 03 /
Henthorne, David Alan 1186 Millhaven Drive Copley OH 44321 / US | 04 /
Dombrosky, Mary Beth 509 Brookpark Drive Cuyahoga Falls OH 44223 / US | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear SA Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [2012/05] |
Former [2009/26] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear SA Patent Department Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 08171153.3 | 10.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | US20070962322 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 962322 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072239 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072239 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/12, B29C33/02, B29C35/02 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
B29D30/0645 (EP,US);
B29C33/02 (EP,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,US);
B29D30/0649 (EP,US);
B29D30/12 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0811 (EP,US);
B29L2030/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reifenbaukernsegmentmanipuliervorrichtung und Verfahren | [2009/26] | English: | Tire building core segment manipulator apparatus and method | [2009/26] | French: | Appareil et procédé de manipulateur de segment central de fabrication de pneu | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 29.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4160007 (PIZZORNO AUGUSTO) [X] 1-15 * column 5, lines 16-27 * * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 18; figures 3,13,14,20-22; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0893237 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-15 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 36 * * column 9, line 58 - column 10, line 49; figures 2-4,7-9; claims 1-8 *; | [X]WO0162480 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 6 * * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 32; figures 2,3a-3c,4; claims 1-10 * | by applicant | US2007125496 | US2007125497 | US4160007 | EP0893237 | WO0162480 | US2004207116 | US2005133149 |