EP2081298 - Multi-mode bit rate processor. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1st Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 / TW | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedersen, Carsten Aagaard 11 Hurd Road Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
Shen, John Zijun 8 Williams Circle Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 03 /
Yan, Aiguo 9 Stafford Ln Andover, MA 01810 / US | 04 /
Mathew, Deepak 2121 Avalon Drive Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | 05 /
Kocic, Marko 43 Marshall St. Somerville, MA 02145 / US | 06 /
Fisher-Jeffes, Timothy Perrin 91 Sydney Street, No. 1015 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
Keller, Thomas 183 Cambridge Road Great Shelford, CB2 5JN / GB | 08 /
Aardoom, Eric 60 Barber Road Framingham, MA 01702 / US | 09 /
Ivory, David Stephen 103 Kings Avenue Ely, Cambridgeshire CB7 4QW / GB | 10 /
Krivacek, Paul D. 183 Carter Field Road North Andover, MA 01845 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight BusinessTowers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08171814.0 | 16.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | US20070008966P | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 8966 P | US20080199640 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: US 199640 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081298 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2081298 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/06, H04L25/06, G06F15/78, H03M13/00 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
G06F15/7842 (EP,US);
H04L1/0052 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/1829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Multimodus-Bitratenprozessor | [2009/30] | English: | Multi-mode bit rate processor. | [2009/30] | French: | Processeur à débit binaire en mode multiple | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 30.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 01.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | 18.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5862189 (HUISKEN JOSEPHUS A [NL], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 2 *; | [A]EP1331742 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0084] *; | [A]WO2005002073 (VIA TECH INC [CN]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 17 - line 21 * * page 8, line 19 - line 28 *; | [A]US2007110197 (BAGCHI AMIT G [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X] - LEUNG S ET AL, "Development of programmable architecture for base-band processing", EUROMICRO CONFERENCE, 2000. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 26TH SEPTEMBER 5-7, 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000905), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7695-0780-4, pages 362 - 367, XP010514801 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EURMIC.2000.874654 | [A] - NILSSON A; TELL ;, LIU D., "Acceleration in Programmable Multi-Standard Baseband Processors", RADIOVETENSKAP OCH KOMMUNIKATION, LINKÖPING, SWEDEN, (200506), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.da.isy.liu.se/pubs/, (20090507), XP002527115 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [PA] - OLGA ZLYDAREVA ET AL, "Multi-Standard WIMAX/UMTS System Framework Based on SDR", AEROSPACE CONFERENCE, 2008 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080301), ISBN 978-1-4244-1487-1, pages 1 - 13, XP031256226 [PA] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005025076 | WO2007027778 | US2007086541 | by applicant | US19660610089 | US20080199640 |