EP2077570 - Trennschalter mit mehreren, parallel angeordneten Trennkammern mit gemeinsamer Übertragung und reduziertem Platzbedarf in der Länge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AREVA T&D SAS Tour Areva 1, place Jean Millier 92084 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states AREVA T&D SAS 1, place Jean Millier 92084 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Areva T & D SA Tour Areva 1, Place Jean Miller 92084 Paris la Defense Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marquezin, Gwenael 24, rue Marcel Dutartre 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Cimala, André 21, rue Maréchal Foch 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08172521.0 | 22.12.2008 | [2009/28] | Priority number, date | FR20080050007 | 02.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850007 | [2009/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2077570 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2077570 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/66 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
H01H33/666 (EP,US);
H01H2033/6667 (EP,US);
H01H2033/6668 (EP,US);
H01H33/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | Circuit breaker with several interruptor tubes arranged in parallel with shared transmission and reduced longitudinal bulk | [2009/28] | English: | Trennschalter mit mehreren, parallel angeordneten Trennkammern mit gemeinsamer Übertragung und reduziertem Platzbedarf in der Länge | [2009/28] | French: | Disjoncteur à plusieurs chambres de coupure agencées en parallèle, à transmission commune et encombrement longitudinal réduit | [2009/28] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.2011 | CY | 09.02.2011 | CZ | 09.02.2011 | DK | 09.02.2011 | EE | 09.02.2011 | FI | 09.02.2011 | HR | 09.02.2011 | HU | 09.02.2011 | IE | 09.02.2011 | IS | 09.02.2011 | LT | 09.02.2011 | LV | 09.02.2011 | MT | 09.02.2011 | NL | 09.02.2011 | PL | 09.02.2011 | RO | 09.02.2011 | SI | 09.02.2011 | SK | 09.02.2011 | TR | 09.02.2011 | BG | 09.05.2011 | NO | 09.05.2011 | GR | 10.05.2011 | ES | 20.05.2011 | PT | 09.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
TR | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
IS | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
MT | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
RO | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
SK | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
DK | 09.02.2011 | ||
EE | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
IE | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 09.02.2011 | |
CY | 09.02.2011 | ||
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
NL | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.02.2011 | |
FI | 09.02.2011 | ||
HR | 09.02.2011 | ||
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
SI | 09.02.2011 | ||
BG | 09.05.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.02.2011 | |
LT | 09.02.2011 | ||
LV | 09.02.2011 | ||
PL | 09.02.2011 | ||
NO | 09.05.2011 | ||
GR | 10.05.2011 | ||
ES | 20.05.2011 | ||
PT | 09.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3895202 (OKERMAN JEAN-CLAUDE, et al) [AD] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]FR2682807 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 * | by applicant | US3895202 | US4562319 | FR20070058322 |