EP2081422 - Housing made of metallic extruded multiposition profils for manufactoring a waterproof eletronic power device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Electronic Systems (IES) 720 Rue Louis Lépine F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biagini, Eric 7 Lot la Margallière 34160 Saint Hilaire de Beauvoir / FR | 02 /
Caussin, Yves La Chaume 13360 Roquevaire / FR | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie Tour Méditerranée 65 avenue Jules Cantini 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 232, avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [2009/30] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 232, Avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08172822.2 | 23.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | FR20080050255 | 16.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850255 | [2009/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081422 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081422 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H05K7/20918 (EP,US);
H05K7/20409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Gehäuse aus stranggepressten Multipositions-Metallprofilen zur Herstellung einer dichten elektronischen Leistungsvorrichtung | [2009/30] | English: | Housing made of metallic extruded multiposition profils for manufactoring a waterproof eletronic power device | [2009/30] | French: | Boîtier en profilés extrudés métalliques multi-positions pour la fabrication d'un dispositif électronique de puissance étanche | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 28.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2008 | CY | 07.03.2012 | CZ | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | HR | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | MT | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | SI | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | NO | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
MT | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
CZ | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
SI | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
HR | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
NO | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
NO | 07.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7911538U (EBERLE WERKE KG, 8500 NUERNBERG) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2007025087 (CHEN WEI-KUANG [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0028] , [0034]; figure 3 *; | [A]WO2007041738 (FRONIUS INT GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, paragraph 5; figures 1,2,10 *; | [A]EP1841302 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRON & COMP [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0020]; figure 7 * |