EP2080737 - Method for treating and fixing quartz sand through activation, fixed quartz sand body and excess voltage protection device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Domanits, Peter Dr.-Pils-Str. 12 92266 Ensdorf / DE | 02 /
Irrgang, Stephan Römeräcker 7 93138 Lappersdorf / DE | 03 /
Obergrusberger, Richard Stockloher Str. 7 93152 Nittendorf-Thumhausen / DE | 04 /
Schmid, Adolf Lohbergstr. 17 A 93164 Laaber / DE | [2009/30] | Application number, filing date | 08172970.9 | 29.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | DE20081004873 | 17.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004873 | [2009/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2080737 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2080737 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/12, H01H85/18, H01H85/04, H01H85/06 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
H01H85/18 (EP);
C01B33/12 (EP);
H01H69/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | C01B33/12, H01H85/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Behandeln und Verfestigen von Quarzsand durch Aktivieren, verfestigter Quarzsandkörper sowie Überstrom-Schutzeinrichtungen | [2009/30] | English: | Method for treating and fixing quartz sand through activation, fixed quartz sand body and excess voltage protection device | [2009/30] | French: | Procédé de traitement et de renforcement de sable siliceux par activation, corps en sable siliceux renforcé et dispositifs de protection contre les surintensités | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 03.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3624535 (MUELLER JEAN OHG ELEKTROTECH [DE]) [X] 9 * columns 1-3; figures 1-3; claims 1-7 * [Y] 1-9; | [Y]DE2431928 (AHLSTROEM OY) [Y] 1-9 * pages 3-6; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]DD287246 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * pages 2-3; claims 1-8 * |