EP1939619 - Apparatus and method for generating nitrogen oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Electron Manufacturing Ltd. 19 Mercers Row Cambridge / GB | [2010/32] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. 81 Wyman Street P.O. Box 9046 Waltham, MA 02254-9046 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alberti, David Marco Gertruda Coba Ritsemastraat 56 2642 CE Pijnacker / NL | 02 /
Smeets, Louis Marie Ortelliusstraat 237 HS 1056 NR Amsterdam / NL | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Parlett, Peter Michael Thermo Fisher Scientific 1 St. George's Court Hanover Business Park Altrincham, Cheshire WA14 5TP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Parlett, Peter Michael Thermo Fisher Scientific 1 St. George's Court Hanover Business Park GB-Altrincham, Cheshire WA14 5TP / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250005.9 | 02.01.2008 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | GB20060026031 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0626031 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939619 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939619 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/12, C01B21/20 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G01N31/12 (EP,GB,US);
C01B21/203 (EP,GB,US);
G01N25/22 (GB);
G01N25/24 (GB);
Y10T436/176152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung von Stickstoffoxidemissionen | [2008/27] | English: | Apparatus and method for generating nitrogen oxides | [2008/27] | French: | Appareil et procédé de génération d'oxydes de nitrogène | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 21.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.12.2010 | CY | 22.12.2010 | CZ | 22.12.2010 | DK | 22.12.2010 | EE | 22.12.2010 | FI | 22.12.2010 | HR | 22.12.2010 | HU | 22.12.2010 | IT | 22.12.2010 | LT | 22.12.2010 | LV | 22.12.2010 | MT | 22.12.2010 | PL | 22.12.2010 | RO | 22.12.2010 | SE | 22.12.2010 | SI | 22.12.2010 | SK | 22.12.2010 | TR | 22.12.2010 | IE | 02.01.2011 | LU | 02.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 22.03.2011 | NO | 22.03.2011 | GR | 23.03.2011 | ES | 02.04.2011 | IS | 22.04.2011 | PT | 22.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
TR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
LU | 02.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
IE | 02.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
MT | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
IT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
DK | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
RO | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
PL | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
SK | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2010 | ||
EE | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
IS | 22.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | ||
NO | 22.03.2011 | ||
GR | 23.03.2011 | ||
ES | 02.04.2011 | ||
PT | 22.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 22.12.2010 | |
CY | 22.12.2010 | ||
FI | 22.12.2010 | ||
HR | 22.12.2010 | ||
LT | 22.12.2010 | ||
LV | 22.12.2010 | ||
SE | 22.12.2010 | ||
SI | 22.12.2010 | ||
BG | 22.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB116503 (ELEKTROCHEMISCHE WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [DY]GB269046 (ALOIS NEGLE); | [A]US4297123 (WYSE HAROLD G, et al); | [DXY]US4879246 (PUESCHEL PETR [CS], et al); | [A]US2005074365 (OLSTOWSKI FRANEK [US]); | [A]EP1630133 (INNOVATIVE OZONE SERVICES INC [CH]) | by applicant | GB269046 | US4879246 |