EP1970462 - Low stress metallic based coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne Inc. 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA 91309 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne Inc. 6633 Canoga Avenue Canoga Park, CA 91309 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strock, Christopher W. 1 Portland Road Kennebunk, ME 04043 / US | 02 /
Davis, Charles 382 Harry Howes Road Sanford, ME 04073 / US | 03 /
Kabara, RIchard M. 194 Skyview Drive Cromwell, CT 06416 / US | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2015/47] |
Former [2008/38] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250165.1 | 14.01.2008 | [2008/38] | Priority number, date | US20070717298 | 13.03.2007 Original published format: US 717298 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1970462 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1970462 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970462 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/12, C23C24/04, C23C24/08, C23C24/10, B23K26/34, C23C4/04, C23C4/06, C22C21/02 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
C23C4/04 (EP,US);
C23C4/067 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (EP,US);
C23C4/123 (EP,US);
C23C4/129 (EP,US);
C23C4/134 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12063 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12083 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1209 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12097 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12535 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12569 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/38] | C23C4/12, C23C24/04, C23C24/08, C23C24/10, B23K26/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/47] |
Former [2011/34] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Metallbasierte Beschichtung mit geringer Spannung | [2008/38] | English: | Low stress metallic based coating | [2008/38] | French: | Revêtement à base de métal à faible contrainte | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 16.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1010861 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-25 * column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2 * * column 3, paragraph 8 - column 4, paragraph 15 * * column 5, paragraph 17 - column 6, paragraph 24 * * claims 1,6-13,17-24 *; | [A]EP0244343 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 30 - line 45 * * page 3, line 36 - page 4, line 61 *; | [A] - PAO P S ET AL, "Fatigue crack growth and fracture toughness in bimodal AI 5083", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM - PROCEEDINGS - MECHANICAL PROPERTIES OF NANOSTRUCTURED MATERIALS AND NONOCOMPOSITES, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY US, (2003), vol. 791, XP002602853 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1010861 |