EP1950730 - Backlight and liquid crystal display using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/31] | Backlight and liquid crystal display | ||
[2011/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Mitsunori c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Morimoto, Tadashi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Mizuta, Minoru c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
Ueda, Mitsunori c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Morimoto, Tadashi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Mizuta, Minoru c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | DeVile, Jonathan Mark, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250279.0 | 22.01.2008 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | JP20070013832 | 24.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007013832 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1950730 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1950730 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1950730 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/34 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G09G3/3426 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G09G2310/0232 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0237 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0633 (EP,US);
G09G2320/064 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0646 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/13] |
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rücklicht und Flüssigkristallanzeige damit | [2011/39] | English: | Backlight and liquid crystal display using the same | [2011/39] | French: | Rétroéclairage et affichage à cristaux liquides l'utilisant | [2011/39] |
Former [2008/31] | Rücklicht und Flüssigkristallanzeige | ||
Former [2008/31] | Backlight and liquid crystal display | ||
Former [2008/31] | Rétroéclairage et affichage à cristaux liquides | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 26.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO2007141732 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-5 * figures 1-5,7 * * page 4, line 26 - page 6, line 4 * * page 7, line 7 - page 10, line 29 *; | [Y]US2006007111 (MOON JEONG-MIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-5 * figures 3A,4,5,6a,6b,6c * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0036] - [0039] - [0042] *; | [Y]DE102004023186 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0013] , [0014]; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1672706 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0039] , [0046] , [0051] , [0052] , [0056] , [0062] , [0063] , [0081] - [0085]; figures 2-7,12 *; | [A]US2005184952 (KONNO AKITOYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0081] - [0083] - [0091] , [0110] - [0122]; figures 1,3,4,12-18 *; | [A]US6633301 (DALLAS JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0038] - [0043]; figures 3-9,6a *; | [A]US2006152468 (OZAKI YUTAKA [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0027] - [0050]; figures 1,3-5 *; | [PX]EP1863009 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0025] - [0028] - [0039] , [0053] , [0054] , [0059]; figures 1,2,3a,3b,4,9,10 *; | [PX]US2007297172 (FURUKAWA NORIMASA [JP], et al) [PX] 1-5 * paragraphs [0043] , [0051] , [0057] - [0061]; figures 3,8,12 * | by applicant | JP2004212503 | JP2004246117 | WO2007141732 | US2006007111 | DE102004023186 |