EP1949875 - External mechanical pressure sensor for gastric band pressure measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242-2839 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dlugos, Daniel F. 8072 Lois Lane Middletown, Ohio 45044 / US | 02 /
Poeppelman, Amy L. 5378 Harbourwatch Way, Unit 104 Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 03 /
Yates, David C. 7534 Galway Ct. West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/31] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250327.7 | 28.01.2008 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | US20070668122 | 29.01.2007 Original published format: US 668122 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1949875 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1949875 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
A61F5/0053 (EP,US);
A61F5/0003 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
A61M5/14586 (EP,US);
A61M5/486 (EP,US);
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B17/1355 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14533 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1077 (EP,US);
A61M2205/073 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | Externer mechanischer Drucksensor zur Messung eines Magenbanddrucks | [2008/31] | English: | External mechanical pressure sensor for gastric band pressure measurements | [2008/31] | French: | Capteur de pression mécanique externe pour mesures de pression de bande gastrique | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 20.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HR | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | MT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | IE | 28.01.2011 | LU | 28.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | BG | 01.03.2011 | NO | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 28.01.2011 | ||
LU | 28.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 28.01.2011 | ||
LU | 28.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 28.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
MT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
HR | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
NO | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]EP1704833 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [DX] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0031] , [0034] - [0037] - [0042] , [0043] , [0049] - [0051] * [A] 2-8,10,11; | [A]EP1736123 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1832252 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [PX] 1,9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0074] , [0077] - [0079] - [0092] - [0094] - [0104] , [0129] - [0136] - [0141] - [0150] *; | [PX]EP1832253 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [PX] 1,9-11 * abstract ** paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0074] , [0077] - [0079] - [0092] - [0094] - [0104] , [0129] - [0136] - [0141] - [0150] * | by applicant | US6067991 |