EP1972770 - Fuel injection control device, engine, and straddle type vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuino, Yoshiaki c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Yamashita, Tomohisa c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2013/15] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
Tsuino, Yoshiaki c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
Yamashita, Tomohisa c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai, Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250572.8 | 19.02.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | JP20070039259 | 20.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007039259 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972770 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972770 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/38, F02D41/40 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
F02D41/3809 (EP);
F02D41/401 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzsteuervorrichtung, Motor und Grätschsitz-Fahrzeug | [2008/39] | English: | Fuel injection control device, engine, and straddle type vehicle | [2008/39] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'injection de carburant et véhicule de type à enfourcher | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2008 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.02.2008 | |
AT | 10.04.2013 | ||
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003070653 (OGAWA KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * page 1, paragraph 8 *; | [X]JP2000257478 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-22 * abstract *; | [X]FR2859763 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-22 * page 3, line 7 - line 14 * | by applicant | JP2001164973 | US2003070653 | JP2000257478 | FR2859763 |