EP1972364 - Game apparatus, virtual camera control method program and recordin medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiroshige, Nobuhisa, @c/o Square Onix., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | 02 /
Isono, Takashi, @c/o Riz Incorporated 4-46-9 Honcho, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0012 / JP | [2015/28] |
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
Hiroshige, Nobuhisa, c/o Square Onix., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | ||
02 /
Isono, Takashi, c/o Riz Incorporated 4-46-9 Honcho, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | Pitchford, James Edward Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250648.6 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | JP20070050036 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007050036 | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1972364 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1972364 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1972364 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/5258 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
A63F13/10 (EP);
A63F13/5258 (US);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F2300/206 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6661 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6684 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/39] | A63F13/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/28] |
Former [2009/34] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung, virtuelles Steuerungsverfahren für Kameras, Programm und Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2008/39] | English: | Game apparatus, virtual camera control method program and recordin medium | [2008/39] | French: | Appareil de jeux, programme de contrôle de caméra virtuelle et support d'enregistrement | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 23.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0933105 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0104] *; | [XY]EP0990458 (KONAMI CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,12-16 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0065] * [Y] 3-5; | [A]US6650329 (KOIKE TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7,12-16* column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 32 *; | [A]EP1506802 (SEGA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,6,7,12-16 * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0138] * * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0150] *; | [A]US2006246968 (DYKE-WELLS TANCRED [GB]) [A] 1,2,6,7,12-16 * paragraph [0065] * | by applicant | EP0933105 | EP0990458 |