EP1983031 - A surface treated flake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 1445 South Spectrum Blvd, Suite 102 Chandler, AZ 85286 / US | [2022/39] |
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | ||
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Viavi Solutions Inc. 430 N. McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | ||
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states JDS Uniphase Corporation 430 N. McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raksha, Vladimir P. 1692 Hopper Avenue Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | 02 /
Kohlmann, Paul T. 9616 Berkshire Way Windsor, CA 95492 / US | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | McKechnie, Neil Henry, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Delta House 50 West Nlle Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2009/41] | Walker, Stephen, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Fulton, David James Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250905.0 | 17.03.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | US20070919204P | 21.03.2007 Original published format: US 919204 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983031 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1983031 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1058 (EP,US);
C09C2200/308 (EP,US);
C09C2200/401 (EP,US);
C09C2200/402 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Oberflächenbehandelte Plättchen | [2008/44] | English: | A surface treated flake | [2008/43] | French: | Copeau traité en surface | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/43] | Oberflächenbehandelte Flocke | Examination procedure | 23.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 17.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US6236510 (BRADLEY JR RICHARD A [US], et al); | [YD]US6902807 (ARGOITIA ALBERTO [US], et al); | [XY]US2005148685 (YAMAMOTO YUKI [JP]); | [XY]US2006014017 (PILOTEK STEFFEN [CH], et al) | by applicant | US6236510 | US6241858 | US2006035080 | US7160375 | US7241489 |