EP1978638 - A negative gm circuit, a filter and low noise amplifier including such a filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Rd. 1st. Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 Taiwan / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MediaTek, Inc No. 1, Dusing Rd. 1st. Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu 300 Taiwan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beffa, Frederico A F via Redondello 23 6982 Agno, Ticino SE10 0QY / CH | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2017/11] |
Former [2009/31] | Rees, Simon John Lewis, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08250937.3 | 18.03.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | US20070784258 | 06.04.2007 Original published format: US 784258 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1978638 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1978638 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1978638 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H03H11/52, H03F1/22 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
H03H11/52 (EP,US);
H03F1/223 (EP,US);
H03F1/56 (EP,US);
H03F3/19 (EP,US);
H03F2200/294 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US);
H03H2011/0488 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2014/18] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Negative Transkonduktanz-Schaltung, Filter und geräuscharmer Verstärker mit derartigem Filter | [2008/41] | English: | A negative gm circuit, a filter and low noise amplifier including such a filter | [2008/41] | French: | Circuit simulant une transconductance négative, filtre et amplificateur à faible bruit comprenant ledit filtre | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3732482 (MAREK A) [X] 1,3,10-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 4, line 24 - column 9, line 56 *; | [XI]US3986152 (HOWELL EDWARD K) [X] 1,3,12-14 * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * column 1, line 46 - column 6, line 20 * [I] 10,11; | [X]JPS51123037 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1,4 *; | [XI]US4053798 (KOIKE SUSUMU, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 3-14 * * column 3, lines 24-63 * [I] 6-9; | [X]US4384300 (IIZUKA TETSUYA [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0607614 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 14,15,22 *; | [X]US5422563 (PFLUEGER RANDALL J [US]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 2A,2B *; | [XA]EP1469600 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-14 * * claims 1,4,5 * * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0026] - [0027] - [0051] * [A] 6-14; | [XA]US2007030103 (LIN YING-YAO [TW], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 4,6 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] * [A] 6-9; | [X] - TAKAGI H ET AL, "Complementary JFET negative-resistance devices", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19751201), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050651, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 509 - 515, XP011421889 [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSSC.1975.1050651 | Examination | US5451915 | US2004017273 | - BRUCHER A ET AL, "NEGATIVE RESISTANCE MONOLITHIC CIRCUITS FOR MICROWAVE PLANAR ACTIVE FILTER LOSSES COMPENSATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH. EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE 1995. BOLOGNA, SEPT. 4 - 7, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE], SWANLEY, NEXUS MEDIA, GB, (19950904), vol. CONF. 25, ISBN 978-1-899919-15-4, pages 910 - 915, XP000681834 | - CHUA L O ET AL, "BIPOLAR - JFET - MOSFET NEGATIVE RESISTANCE DEVICES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970204), vol. CAS-32, no. 1, pages 46 - 61, XP002024214 | by applicant | - J. A. MACEDO ET AL., "A 1.9 GHz Silicon Receiver with Monolithic Image Filtering", JSSC, (199803), vol. 33, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/4.661203, XP000774520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.661203 |