EP1985359 - Method and apparatus for microwave assisted processing of feedstocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petróleo Brasileiro S.A. Petrobras Avenida República do Chile 65 Rio de Janeiro, RJ / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Petroleo Brasileiro S.A. Petrobras Avenida Republica do Chile 65 Rio de Janeiro RJ / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marques Moreira, Elizabeth Rua Souza Lima, n[deg]. 385, apt. 701, Copacabana Rio de Janeiro, RJ, CEP 22.081-010 / BR | 02 /
Baldini Cardoso, Mauri José Rua Mal. Ramon Castilla, n[deg]. 141, apt. 703, Botafogo Rio de Janeiro, RJ, CEP 22.290-175 / BR | 03 /
Gouveia de Araújo, Sumair Av. Prof. Lineu Prestes, n[deg]. 2242, Cidade Universitária São Paulo, SP, CEP 05.508-900 / BR | 04 /
Takahashi, Jiro Av. Prof. Lineu Prestes, n[deg]. 2242, Cidade Universitária São Paulo, SP, CEP 05.508-900 / BR | 05 /
Souza de Alencar, Maurício Rua Roberto Dias Lopes, n[deg]. 200, Apt. 203, Leme Rio de Janeiro, RJ, CEP 22.010.110 / BR | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Roberts, Mark Peter J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251140.3 | 28.03.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | BR2007PI01638 | 24.04.2007 Original published format: BR PI0701638 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985359 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/12 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B01J19/126 (EP,US);
C10G15/08 (EP,US);
C10G15/10 (EP,US);
C10G45/02 (EP,US);
C10G47/00 (EP,US);
H05B6/802 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/28] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bahandlung von Einsatzstoffen mit Mikrowellen | [2008/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for microwave assisted processing of feedstocks | [2008/44] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le traitement de matière avec des micro-ondes | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6422002 (WHEALTON JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,41* column 5, lines 15-35; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2006024379 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,41 * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 17; figure 1; claim 16 * | by applicant | US5382414 | US6120741 | JP2002113350 | US6614010 | US6867400 | BRPI0605000 | - CUNDY, C., "Microwave Techniques in the Synthesis and Modification of Zeolite Catalysts. A Review Collect", CZECH. CHEM, COMMUN, (1998), vol. 63, pages 1699 - 1723 | - VARMA, R. S., "Solvent-free accelerated organic synthesis using microwaves", PURE APPL. CHEM, (2001), vol. 73, no. 1, pages 193 - 198 | - VARMA, R. S., "Solvent-free accelerated organic synthesis using microwaves", PURE APPL. CHEM, COMMUN. CHEM, (2001), vol. 73, no. 1, pages 193 - 198 | - EBERHARD ET AL., "Microwave enhanced Hydrogenations at Medium Pressure Using a Newly Constructed Reactor", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, pages 1247 - 1249 | - PIPUS ET AL., "Esterification of Benzoic Acid with 2-Ethylhexanol in a Microwave Stirred-Tank Reactor", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2002), vol. 41, no. 5, pages 1129 - 1134 | - KIM ET AL., "Dieletric catalysts for Microwave-Induced Dehydrogenation of Ethane into Ethylene", PAPER 467 |