EP1995831 - Electrical fixture combined with a wireless communication device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optimal Innovations Inc International Head Office Chamberlain Place, Broad Street Bridgetown / BB | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoettle, Roland 6 Puerto Allegre Midshipman Road Freeport / BS | [2009/28] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
Schoettle, Roland 6 Puerto Allegre Midshipman Road Freeport, Bahamas / US | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08251799.6 | 23.05.2008 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | US20070940010P | 24.05.2007 Original published format: US 940010 P | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995831 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/66, H04Q7/30 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
H04W88/10 (EP);
H04B1/59 (KR);
H01R13/665 (EP);
H04B7/14 (KR);
H04L12/2838 (EP);
H01R13/652 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/78 (EP);
H01R25/006 (EP);
H04L2012/2841 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | Elektrische Vorrichtung mit einer eingebauten drahtlosen Kommunikationseinrichtung | [2008/48] | English: | Electrical fixture combined with a wireless communication device | [2008/48] | French: | Dispositif électrique comprenant un dispositif de communication sans fil | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 03.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/23] | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6146632 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-17 * abstract *; | [X]US5424859 (UEHARA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * figures 1,2,14 *; | [X]US6222503 (GIETEMA WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract ** figures 1A,1B,2,14 *; | [X]EP1263150 (DLR EV [DE]) [X] 1-17 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2004066539 (SYMBOL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2004242290 (KEELING MICHAEL C [US]) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 5-8,7A * * paragraph [0038] *; | [X]DE202004014389U (BECK WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]DE102004042560 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0007] , [0015] *; | [X]US2006276144 (CAMPBELL JACK [US]) [X] 1-17 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0012] * |