EP2007136 - Motion-image pickup method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/52] | Motion-image photography method and apparatus | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misawa, Atsushi, c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6 1-chome Matsuzakadaira Taiwa-cho Korukawa-gun Miyagi / JP | 02 /
Sato, Tsuneo, c/o Fujifilm Corporation 6 1-chome Matsuzakadaira Taiwa-cho Korukawa-gun Miyagi / JP | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Stevens, Jason Paul Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252108.9 | 19.06.2008 | [2008/52] | Priority number, date | JP20070162739 | 20.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007162739 | [2008/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2007136 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2007136 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, G11B27/00 | [2011/35] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP);
H04N23/631 (EP,US);
H04N5/772 (EP);
H04N5/765 (EP);
H04N5/775 (EP);
H04N9/7921 (EP);
H04N9/8042 (EP);
H04N9/8047 (EP);
H04N9/8205 (EP);
H04N9/8227 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/52] | H04N5/232 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/19] |
Former [2008/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bewegungsbilderfassungsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2010/42] | English: | Motion-image pickup method and apparatus | [2010/42] | French: | Procédé et appareil de prises d'images en mouvement | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/52] | Bewegungsbild-Fotografieverfahren und Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2008/52] | Motion-image photography method and apparatus | ||
Former [2008/52] | Procédé et appareil de photographie d'images en mouvement | Examination procedure | 24.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1107613 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0030] - [0036]; figures 6,8,10 *; | [A]US2003038884 (MATSUSHITA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0194] - [0204]; figure 18 *; | [I]US2004095396 (STAVELY DONALD J [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] - [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004264789 (AKIYAMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0031] , [0 40] - [0043]; figure 3A * | by applicant | JP2003023600 | JP2003274368 | JP2005311665 | JP2006121183 |