EP2012342 - Hybrid etch chamber with decoupled plasma controls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEVAC, INC. 3560 Bassett Street Santa Clara California 95054 / US | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Jang Gyoo 1960 Spanish Bay Court San Jose CA, 95138 / US | 02 /
Barnes, Michael 12215 Santa Teresa Drive San Ramon CA, 94583 / US | 03 /
Bluck, Terry 3128 Butte Street Sanza Clara CA, 95051 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen, Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252118.8 | 19.06.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | US20070749069 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: US 749069 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2012342 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2012342 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
H01J37/321 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32091 (EP,US);
H01J37/32165 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32862 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/18] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybridätzkammer mit entkoppelten Plasmasteuerungen | [2009/02] | English: | Hybrid etch chamber with decoupled plasma controls | [2009/02] | French: | Chambre de gravure hybride avec contrôles de plasma découplés | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5882424 (TAYLOR BRAD [US], et al) [Y] 18,20 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 35 - column 8, line 62 *; | [XYI]US2002004309 (COLLINS KENNETH S [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2,12 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0150] * [Y] 3,5,6,9 [I] 2,7,8,10,11; | [XYI]US6422172 (TANAKA JYUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 13 * figures 1,4 * * column 4, line 29 - line 39 * * column 6, line 49 - line 52 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 30 * [Y] 14,15,18-20 [I] 16,17; | [AD]US2005133163 (SHANNON STEVEN C [US], et al) [AD] 1-20 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO2005093780 (VARIAN SEMICONDUCTOR EQUIPMENT [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,9,14,15 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [Y]US2005241762 (PATERSON ALEXANDER [US], et al) [Y] 3,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0068] *; | [XP]EP1860680 (NEW POWER PLASMA CO LTD [KR]) [XP] 1 * figures 1,6 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] ** paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *; | [XP]WO2008010943 (LAM RES CORP [US], et al) [XP] 13 * figure 4 * * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * |