EP2088552 - Digital signage network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord ON L4K 4M3 / CA | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bannister, Doug c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 02 /
Underwood, Doug c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 03 /
Kayes, Scott c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 04 /
Chu, William c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 05 /
Collard, Andrew c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 06 /
Easthope, Nick c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | 07 /
Dalley, Rick c/o Omnivex Corporation 3300 Highway 7, Suite 501 Concord, Ontario L4K 4M3 / CA | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252258.2 | 02.07.2008 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | CA20082620337 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: CA 2620337 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088552 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06Q10/00 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F3/00 (KR);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G09F27/00 (US);
G09F9/00 (US);
G09F9/30 (US);
G09F9/3023 (US);
G09F9/3026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Netzwerk für digitale Beschilderung | [2009/33] | English: | Digital signage network | [2009/33] | French: | Réseau de signature numérique | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | 05.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2011 | 08.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0485252 (TEKNEKRON SOFTWARE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * page 7, lines 20-27 * * page 34, line 24 - page 37, line 16 *; | [X]US2006059511 (NOCIFERA ALEXANDER D [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] *; | [X]WO2007127384 (SYMON COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16* page 7, lines 15-28 *; | [X] - ADTRACTION, "Adtraction Digital Signage Solutions", (200709), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.adtraxion.com/en/doc/Adtraxion_brochure_EN.pdf, (20081023), XP002500936 [X] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0485252 | US2006059511 | WO2007127384 | - ADTRAXION DIGITAL SIGNAGE SOLUTIONS, (200709), pages 1 - 12, URL: http://www.adtraxion.com/en! doc/Adtraxion -Lbrochure - EN. pdf |