EP2071548 - Plasma display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeuchi, Masanori c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252463.8 | 18.07.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | JP20070323315 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007323315 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2071548 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G09G3/293 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/2022 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/021 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/08] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigevorrichtung | [2009/25] | English: | Plasma display device | [2009/25] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à plasma | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1049068 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] - [0016] - [0026] - [0039] - [0055] - [0057] - [0063]; figures 2-7 *; | [A]US2002027566 (NAKA KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0046] - [0060] - [0062]; figures 4-6 *; | [A] - HOPPENBROUWERS J ET AL, "43.4: Address Time Reduction in PDPs by means of Partial Line Doubling", 2001 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM - JUNE 3-8, 2001, SAN JOSE CONVENTION CENTER, CALIFORNIA, (20010603), vol. XXXII, page 1142, XP007007754 [A] 1-17 * Section 2; * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JP2007323315 | JP2000347616 | JP2003233346 |