EP2085129 - Marionette toy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 4-8, Komagata 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 4-8, Komagata 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitsugi, Kaori c/o Bandai Co., Ltd. 4-8, Komagata 1-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ono, Hiroko c/o Bandai Co., Ltd. 4-8, Komagata 1-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Atsunori c/o Bandai (H.K.)Co., Ltd. Room 2902, 29/F, United Centre 95 Queensway Hong Kong / HK | 04 /
Kubota, Takeshi c/o Shine Co. Ltd., 2nd Floor, 1-10, Yanagibashi 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252726.8 | 18.08.2008 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | JP20080021572 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008021572 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2085129 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63H13/02, A63J19/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
A63H13/02 (EP,US);
A63H33/00 (KR);
A63H3/00 (KR);
A63H5/00 (KR);
A63J19/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Marionettenspielzeug | [2009/32] | English: | Marionette toy | [2009/32] | French: | Marionnette | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 09.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 23.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9420499U (DUEWELHENKE GABRIELE [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1033159 (GIOCHI PREZIOSI LUSSEMBURGO S [LU]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0038] , [0047] , [0048]; figure - *; | [A]US2629966 (RUSS JOHN A) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 5, line 11; figure - *; | [A]US4297806 (ILKCAGLA EDWARD A) [A] 1 * column 1, line 37 - line 53; figure - *; | [A]US862625 (FIELD THOMAS V [US]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 35 - line 105; figure - * | by applicant | JPS4824838 | JPS5417390U | JP3110565U | JP20080021572 |