EP2037089 - Oil removal system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIGGS & STRATTON CORPORATION 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa Wisconsin 53222 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Briggs & Stratton 12301 West Wirth Street Wauwatosa WI 53222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raasch, Jason J. W61 N424 Washington Avenue Cedarburg, WI 53212 / US | 02 /
Matuszak, Ray 2885 S. 149th St. New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | 03 /
Matel, Elliot 4555 S.Lenox Milwaukee, WI 53207 / US | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
Rassch, Jason J. W61 N424 Washington Avenue Cedarburg, WI 53212 / US | ||
02 /
Matuszak, Ray 2885 S. 149th St. New Berlin, WI 53151 / US | |||
03 /
Matel, Elliot 4555 S.Lenox Milwaukee, WI 53207 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252996.7 | 10.09.2008 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | US20070856164 | 17.09.2007 Original published format: US 856164 | [2009/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037089 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2037089 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/04, F02P11/04 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
F01M13/025 (EP,US);
F01M11/04 (EP,US);
F01M11/045 (EP,US);
F01M13/023 (EP,US);
F02N11/00 (EP,US);
F02N3/02 (EP,US);
F02P11/025 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/12] | F01M11/04 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/27] |
Former [2009/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ölentfernungssystem und -verfahren | [2009/12] | English: | Oil removal system and method | [2009/12] | French: | Système et procédé d'élimination d'huile | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 17.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1520974 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figure 3 * [Y] 5; | [X]DE202005003462U (HENGST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6 * figure 2 *; | [Y]JPS5218319U (-) [Y] 5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5386881 (ESHELMAN WALTER L [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 5 - line 39; figure 1 * |