EP2039723 - Room temperature curable organopolysiloxane composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Tsuneo c/o Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-Machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Teshigawara, Mamoru c/o Silicone-Electronics Materials Research Center Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Hitomi Matsuida-Machi Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253077.5 | 19.09.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20070244923 | 21.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007244923 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2039723 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2039723 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039723 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/08, C08K5/13 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
C08K5/5465 (EP,US);
C08L83/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/5465, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08L83/08, C08L83/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/43] |
Former [2009/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bei Raumtemperatur härtbare Organopolysiloxan-Zusammensetzung | [2009/13] | English: | Room temperature curable organopolysiloxane composition | [2009/13] | French: | Composition d'organopolysiloxane durcissable à température ambiante | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 16.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9966012 (LOCTITE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]EP0816436 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-4 * comp. ex.1;; example -; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]US2004147674 (KAKEDA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0294]; example -; claim -; tables 3,4 * | by applicant | JPS6123942B | US4485206 | JPH07119361B | US5064898 |