EP2047906 - Aromatic isomerization catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road, P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitchurch, Patrick Charles c/o UOP LLC 8725 Old Mooringsport Road Shreveport, LA 71107 / US | 02 /
Bogdan, Paula Lucy c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | 03 /
Bauer, John Edward c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
Whitchurch, Patrick Charles c/o UOP LLC 8725 Old Mooringsport Road Shreveport, LA 71107 / US | ||
02 /
Bogdan, Paula Lucy c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | |||
03 /
Bauer, John Edward c/o UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/12] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | Chung, Hsu Min Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253097.3 | 23.09.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | US20070868844 | 08.10.2007 Original published format: US 868844 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047906 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2047906 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/74, B01J35/10, C07C5/27 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
B01J29/7469 (EP,US);
B01J29/06 (KR);
B01J21/04 (KR);
B01J23/42 (KR);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/66 (EP,US);
C07C5/2708 (EP,US);
B01J2229/20 (EP,US);
B01J2229/42 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C5/2708, C07C15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, PT, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2009/52] | FR, PT, TR | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aromatischer Isomerisierungskatalysator | [2009/16] | English: | Aromatic isomerization catalyst | [2009/16] | French: | Catalyseur d'isomérisation aromatique | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 16.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, RO, SE, SI, SK | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0135658 (TEIJIN PETROCHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 17, line 3 - page 19, line 3; claim 9 *; | [X]US5081084 (SACHTLER JOHANN W A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 48 - column 7, line 2; example I(A); claim - *; | [A]US2004097363 (JOHNSON IVY D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 8; claims 1,10,11 *; | [X]US2005143615 (BOGDAN PAULA L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * examples II,III; claim - *; | [A] - NAYAK V S ET AL, "ISOMERIZATION OF m-XYLENE ON H-ZSM-5 - 1. INFLUENCE ON CATALYTIC ACTIVITY AND SELECTIVITY OF Si/Al RATIO, DEGREE OF CATION EXCHANGE, DEAMMONIATION CONDITIONS AND POISONING OF STRONGER ACID SITES.", APPLIED CATALYSIS 1982 DEC 15, (19821215), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 333 - 352, XP002511424 [A] 1-10 * page 341 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0166-9834(82)80132-2 | by applicant | US2620314 | US3201491 | US3832449 | US4452769 | US4537758 | US6652832 | US6740788 | US2005143615 | - BARRETT, E. P.; JOYNER, L. G.; HALENDA, P. P., "The Determination of Pore Volume and Area Distributions in Porous Substances; I. Computations from Nitrogen Isotherms", J. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1951), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1021/ja01145a126, pages 373 - 380, XP001145601 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01145a126 |