EP2042343 - Security device, reflective coating and layer therefor, and associated method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OpSec Security Group, Inc. 535 16th Street Suite 920 Denver, CO 80202 / US | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Matthew D. 3155 Steltz Road New Freedom, Pennsylvania 17349 / US | 02 /
Hill, Dean 13260 Line Road New Freedom, Pennsylvania 17349 / US | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Parry, Simon James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253128.6 | 25.09.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | US20070974910P | 25.09.2007 Original published format: US 974910 P | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042343 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, C09D7/12, G02B5/18, C08J5/00 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
G02B5/0808 (EP,US);
G02B5/1861 (EP,US);
G02B5/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung, reflektierende Beschichtung und Schicht dafür sowie zugehöriges Verfahren | [2009/14] | English: | Security device, reflective coating and layer therefor, and associated method | [2009/14] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité, revêtement réfléchissant, couche correspondante et procédé associé | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 23.09.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0018591 (SECURENCY PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,11,12,17 *; | [X]DE10248870 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, paragraph 26 - paragraph 27 ** claims 1,5,8 *; | [X]US2005078158 (MAGDASSI SHLOMO [IL], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,4,5 *; | [X]GB2416738 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [X] 1-20 * claims 1,4,10-12 * * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 6 *; | [XP]EP1862827 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [XP] 1-20 * claims 1-4,10,12,18 * * page 3, paragraph 20 * * page 6, paragraph 42 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 51 *; | [XP]WO2007140484 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1-20 * page 1, line 10 - line 15 * * claims 1,32,46 * * abstract * * page 27, line 4 - page 30, line 3 * * page 38, line 25 - line 34 *; | [X] - LORENZ ZIMMERMANN ET AL, High refractive index films of polymer nanocomposites, JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, WARRENDALE, PA, PAGE(S) 1742 - 1748, (19930101), ISSN 0884-2914, XP009111038 [X] 1-10 * page 1743 - page 1744 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.1993.1742 | by applicant | DE10248870 | US2005078158 | GB2416738 | EP1862827 | WO2007140484 | - LORENZ ZIMMERMANN ET AL., "High refractive index films of polymer nanocomposites", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS RESEARCH, MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY, (19930101), doi:doi:10.1557/JMR.1993.1742, pages 1742 - 1748, XP009111038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/JMR.1993.1742 |