EP2098383 - Disc rotor pilot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consolidated Metco, Inc. 5701 SE Columbia Way Vancouver, WA 98661 / US | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippis, Daniel J. 4545 NW Owyhee Court Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Ramsay, Laura Anne Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Ramsay, Laura Anne Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Ramsay, Laura Anne Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2009/37] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square GB-London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253220.1 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | US20080074191 | 03.03.2008 Original published format: US 74191 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098383 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098383 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60B27/00, F16D65/12 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1384 (EP,US);
F16D2065/1392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [2010/19] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | BA | 07.10.2009 | Title | German: | Führung für Bremsscheibe auf Radnabe | [2009/37] | English: | Disc rotor pilot | [2009/37] | French: | Guidage pour disc de frein sur un moyeu | [2009/37] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 05.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19723578 (FAG AUTOMOBILTECHNIK AG [DE]) [X] 1,10,15 * the whole document * [A] 2-9,11-14; | [XA]US6250814 (TAJIMA EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [A] 2-9,11-15; | [XA]WO0073003 (SIMPSON IND INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * page 12, lines 4 - 25; figure 2 * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [XA]FR2723886 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [X] 1,9 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 16; figures 3-6 * [A] 2-8,10-15; | [A]DE19909285 (FAG AUTOMOBILTECHNIK AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-4; claims 1, 2 * |