EP2180107 - Building wall with improved insulation properties and fixing assembly for use in the building wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwool International A/S 584 Hovedgaden 2460 Hedehusene / DK | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Samuels, Lucy Alice Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253399.3 | 21.10.2008 | [2010/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180107 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/74 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
E04B2/7412 (EP);
E04B2/7457 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gebäudewand mit verbesserten Isolierungseigenschaften und Befestigungsanordnung zur Verwendung in der Gebäudewand | [2010/17] | English: | Building wall with improved insulation properties and fixing assembly for use in the building wall | [2010/17] | French: | Construction d'un mur doté de propriétés isolantes améliorées et ensemble de fixation à utiliser pour la construction du mur | [2010/17] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/39] | 20.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6125608 (CHARLSON JOSEPH A [US]) [Y] 1-14 * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 8 * * column 11, line 1 - line 23 * * column 19, line 31 - line 43; figures 23,24 *; | [Y]DE4441567 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 27, paragraph 54 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 1; example - *; | [A]EP1184523 (HOLZWERKE WIMMER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4-9,11-14 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026]; figure - *; | [A]US2003070367 (GELIN LAWRENCE J [US], et al) [A] 1,5-9,11-14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure - *; | [A]GB2447562 (PROCTOR GROUP LTD A [GB]) [A] 1,11,13 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph L * * page 9, paragraph 2; claims 1,2,9 * | by applicant | GB339304 | DE10147831 | EP0849420 | EP1179645 | EP0801190 | WO2004001154 | US2002094426 | US6485805 | US6479416 | WO2006065904 | WO9832709 | US2007004306 | US5789075 | US5306555 | US6770584 | US6083619 | US6080475 | US5973015 | US6087407 | US5086085 | US4873218 |