EP2062624 - Display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsang, Kwok Choi Flat A, Ground Floor, On Ho Industrial Building 17-19 Shing Wan Road Tai Wai, Shatin, New Territories Hong Kong / CN | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | White, Duncan Rohan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253471.0 | 24.10.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | CN200710124581 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: CN200710124581 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062624 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/12, A63F9/06 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A63F9/12 (EP);
A63F2009/1216 (EP);
A63F2009/122 (EP);
A63F2009/1224 (EP);
A63F2009/124 (EP);
A63F2009/2457 (EP);
A63F2250/302 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/05] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2009/22] | English: | Display apparatus | [2009/22] | French: | Appareil d'affichage | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2371242 (HUANG TE-LI [CN]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * abstract * * figures 5,6,9 * [Y] 5; | [XY]FR2646889 (RABA RAOUL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,7-11 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 10 * * figures 26-29 * [Y] 5; | [XY]US4003144 (MADDESTRA ROBERT, et al) [X] 1-4,7 * figure - * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5702105 (GLIKMANN KEVIN L [US]) [Y] 5 * figures 9-11 *; | [A]US6398221 (GRAHAM JOHN ALEXANDER [GB]) [A] 7,8 * figure 5a * | by applicant | CN2801238 | CN2817932 |