EP2055280 - Absorbent article including an absorbent layer having a plurality of spaced beam elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | [2016/23] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bissah, Kofi Ayensu 16 Patton Drive Somerset, NJ 08873 / US | 02 /
De Oliveira, Richardo 516 Clydesdale Drive New Hope, PA 18938 / US | 03 /
Tremblay, Denis 946, 28th Avenue Pointe-aux-Trembles, Quebec H1A 4M5 / CA | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253526.1 | 29.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | US20070983780P | 30.10.2007 Original published format: US 983780 P | US20070957969 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: US 957969 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2055280 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2055280 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/532, A61F13/537 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
A61F13/53747 (EP,US);
A61F13/536 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53778 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/12] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Absorbierender Artikel mit Absorbierschicht mit mehreren voneinander beabstandeten Strahlenelementen | [2009/19] | English: | Absorbent article including an absorbent layer having a plurality of spaced beam elements | [2009/19] | French: | Article absorbant incluant une couche absorbante doté d'une pluralité d'éléments de faisceau espacés | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 16.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/36] | 01.08.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.09.2017 | 12.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4029101 (CHESKY SHELDON R, et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,11 * figures 1, 5; column 2, lines 11-13 *; | [X]US5134007 (REISING GEORGE S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,11 * figures 1-3; column 4, line 51-column 5, line 26, column 5, lines 41, 65; column 6, lines 3-5; column 16, lines 18-22; claim 5 *; | [X]US6221460 (WEBER MARY EVA GARVIE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,10,11 * figures 1, 4, 5, 6a, 7; column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 15; column 2, lines 49-50, column 4, lines 19-23; column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 7; column 5, lines 44-55; column 7, lines 35-37 *; | [X]US6432094 (FUJIOKA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * figures 1, 2, 6; column 1, lines 6-8; column 3, lines 10-30, 53-63; column 4, lines 7-9, 35-40; column 6, lines 61-64 *; | [X]US2003045851 (VARTIAINEN KENT [SE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10,11 * figures 1, 2a, 2c; paragraphs 3, 20, 22, 38-43, 45, 46, 48, 53; claim 5 *; | [X]JP2003070842 (LIVEDO CORP) [X] 1,3,5,6,11 * figures 2, 3, 7a *; | [XA]US2004243078 (GUIDOTTI TED [SE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * figures 1, 3; paragraphs 3, 25, 38-39 * [A] 10; | [X]US6955667 (TANAKA MASAHITO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1, 6; column 1, lines 1-13; summary; column 3, lines 4-27; column 9, lines 11-45 *; | [A]US2007135788 (DAMAY EMMANUELLE [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,6,11* figures 1, 3, 4; paragraphs 97-99 * | Examination | US6494871 | by applicant | US4555430 | US4589876 | US4608047 | US4687478 | US4900320 | US5916670 |