EP2068232 - Touch-sensitive sheet member, input device and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takashima, Kouichiro c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kayama, Shun c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Shimizu, Yukiko c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sawada, Takashi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253829.9 | 27.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070308089 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007308089 | JP20080154552 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008154552 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2068232 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2068232 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, B32B7/02 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/51 (EP,US);
B32B2457/00 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
B32B2457/202 (EP,US);
B32B2457/208 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04809 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24983 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2015/21] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Berührungsempfindliches Plattenelement, Eingabevorrichtung und elektronisches Gerät | [2009/24] | English: | Touch-sensitive sheet member, input device and electronic apparatus | [2009/24] | French: | Élément de feuille tactile, dispositif d'entrée et appareil électronique | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002149572 (SCHULZ STEPHEN C [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0075] *; | [XA]US6522322 (MAEDA TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * [A] 3,4,7-14; | [X]GB881287 (PIER MARIA ANNONI DI GUSSOLA, et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2007308089 | JP2008154552 | JPH02230310 | JP2005063227 | JP2004070505 | JP2004094389 | WO2004094389 |