EP2068547 - Apparatus, system and method for image processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimura, Hiroshi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, MAsaaki c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
Haike, Guan c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
Ishizu, Taeko c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
Saitoh, Takashi c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
Yoshida, Hiroyuki c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08253915.6 | 08.12.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070316315 | 06.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007316315 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2068547 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/32 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H04N1/4413 (EP,US);
H04N1/00854 (EP,US);
H04N1/00875 (EP,US);
H04N1/32144 (EP,US);
H04N1/32208 (EP,US);
H04N1/444 (EP,US);
H04N1/00347 (EP,US);
H04N1/32106 (EP,US);
H04N1/32133 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0039 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0094 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3202 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3204 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3226 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, System und Verfahren der Bildverarbeitung | [2009/24] | English: | Apparatus, system and method for image processing | [2009/24] | French: | Appareil, système et procédé de traitement d'images | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 07.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04310175 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0843237 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2000175057 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004222141 (RICOH KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US6903833 (MURATA KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2005197824 (KYOCERA MITA CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2007019245 (KATSURABAYASHI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | WO8907819 | EP1715673 | by applicant | JPH11355557 | EP1385327 |