EP2096485 - Eyewear with adjustable temples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states North Safety Products Ltd. 10550 Parkway Blvd. Anjou QC H1J 2K4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamontagne, Marc 250 rue Lanoue Repentigny, Quebec J6A 1W1 / CA | 02 /
Isabelle, Paul 4910 rue des Halliers Saint-Augustin-de-Desmaures, Quebec G3A 1A6 / CA | 03 /
Doyon, Jean-Christophe 3190 Chemin Comtois Terrebonne, Quebec J6X 4H5 / CA | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/04] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2011/37] | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08290195.0 | 28.02.2008 | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2096485 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2096485 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02C1/02, G02C5/12, G02C5/20, G02C5/22, G02C3/00 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
G02C3/003 (EP);
G02C1/02 (EP);
G02C5/124 (EP);
G02C5/20 (EP);
G02C5/2209 (EP);
G02C5/2263 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | G02C3/00, G02C5/16, G02C5/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/04] |
Former [2010/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [2010/18] | |||
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brille mit einstellbaren Bügeln | [2009/36] | English: | Eyewear with adjustable temples | [2009/36] | French: | Lunettes à branches réglables | [2009/36] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 20.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 25.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19215824.4 / EP3640711 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 20.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 20.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2008 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | IE | 28.02.2020 | LU | 28.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
IE | 28.02.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.02.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2241225 (KOKETSU SOTOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 3, lines 7-23 * * page 5, lines 18-34 *; | [A]US5631718 (MARKOVITZ AARON M [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 59 *; | [A]US5790229 (POLONI ANTONIO [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 2, lines 19-63 *; | [X]US2005088613 (JACKSON MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 4, paragraphs 65-70 * | by applicant | US6059411 | US2005088613 |