EP2016974 - Multiple-electrode probe and system for deep brain stimulation including such a probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benabid, Alim Louis 23 bis, avenue de l'Eygala 38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
Sauter-Starace, Fabien 22 rue de Sisteron 38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | 03 /
Caillat, Patrice 8 rue de la Mure 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2009/04] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | Priori, Enrico, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08290644.7 | 01.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | FR20070004804 | 03.07.2007 Original published format: FR 0704804 | [2009/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2016974 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
A61N1/0529 (EP,US);
A61N1/0531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonde mit Mehrfachelektroden und System zur elektrischen Tiefenneurostimulation mit Hilfe einer solchen Sonde | [2009/04] | English: | Multiple-electrode probe and system for deep brain stimulation including such a probe | [2009/04] | French: | Sonde à électrodes multiples et système pour neurostimulation électrique profonde comportant une telle sonde | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 22.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6529774 (GREENE DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 4, line 43 - line 65 * * column 9, line 64 - column 11, line 8 * * column 11, line 35 - line 59; figure - *; | [X]US2005222647 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0048] , [0051] , [0057]; figure - *; | [A]US2006041295 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0038] , [0041]; figure - *; | [X]US2007088404 (WYLER ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0046]; figures 7-10 * | Examination | WO9956817 | US2007027514 | US2007150039 | by applicant | US6512958 | US7162308 | FR2912921 | - P. KRACK ET AL., THE LANCET, (19971206), vol. 350 | - A.L. BENABID ET AL., ACTA NEUROCHIRURGICA, (1993), vol. 58, pages 39 - 44 | - A. TAKAKI ET AL., "Feeding suppression elicted by electrical and chemical stimulation of monkey hypothalamus", AM. J. PHYSIOL., page 262 | - REGULATORY INTEGRATIVE COMP. PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 31, pages R5866 - R594 | - K. SANO ET AL., "Results of stimulation and destruction of the posterior hypothalamus in man", J NEUROSURG, (197012), vol. 33, pages 689 - 707 | - C. BIELAJEW; J. STENGER; D. SCHINDLER, "Factors that contribute to reduce weight gain following chronic ventromedial stimulation", BEHAV. BRAIN RES., (1994), vol. 62, pages 143 - 146 | - F. BROWN ET AL., "Changes in food intake with electrical stimulation of the ventromedial hypothalamus in dogs", J. NEUROSURG., (1984), vol. 60, pages 1253 - 1257 | - H.S. MAYBERG ET AL., "Deep Brain Stimulation for Treatment-Resistant Depression", NEURON, (20050303), vol. 45, pages 651 - 660 | - KEE KEUN LEE ET AL., BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, (2004), vol. 20, pages 404 - 407 |