EP2039815 - Cleaning and/or skin care item comprising a raised pattern on its surface and production method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA TISSUE FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 11, route Industrielle 68320 Kunheim / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bret, Bruno 16, rue du Neufeld 68920 Wintzenheim / FR | 02 /
Clermont, Anne-Gaëlle 46b, sentier de la Luss Allée des Aquarelles 68000 Colmar / FR | 03 /
Gregoire, Philippe 16, domain de la Courcanne 27700 Les Andelys / FR | 04 /
Louis dit Picard, Bernard La Grosse Londe St-Nicolas du Bosc 27370 Amfreville la Campagne / FR | [2012/30] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Bret, Bruno 16, rue du Neufeld 68920 Wintzenheim / FR | ||
02 /
Clermont, Anne-Gaëlle 46b, sentier de la Luss Allée des Aquarelles 68000 Colmar / FR | |||
03 /
Gregoire, Philippe 16, domain de la Courcanne 27700 Les Andelys / FR | |||
04 /
Louis dit Picard, Bernard La Grosse Londe, St-Nicolas du Bosc 27370 Amfreville la Campagne / FR | Representative(s) | Cortier, Sophie, et al SCA TISSUE FRANCE Département Brevets 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Cortier, Sophie, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2010/36] | Cortier, Sophie, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/13] | Cortier, Sophie Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08290746.0 | 01.08.2008 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | FR20070005878 | 17.08.2007 Original published format: FR 0705878 | [2009/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039815 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2039815 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/02, D04H1/12, D04H1/46, D04H13/00, A61K8/02 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
D04H1/02 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61Q1/14 (EP,US);
D04H1/12 (EP,US);
D04H1/4266 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,US);
D04H1/52 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/58 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
D04H3/005 (EP,US);
D04H3/015 (EP,US);
D04H3/11 (EP,US);
D04H3/115 (EP,US);
D04H3/14 (EP,US);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | Gegenstand zur Reinigung und/oder Pflege der Haut, der ein Reliefmotiv an seiner Oberfläche umfasst und Herstellungsverfahren besagten Gegenstands | [2009/13] | English: | Cleaning and/or skin care item comprising a raised pattern on its surface and production method thereof | [2009/13] | French: | Article de nettoyage et/ou de soin de la peau comportant un motif en relief à sa surface et procédé de fabrication dudit article | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/45] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.07.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.07.2012 | MT | 25.07.2012 | LU | 01.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | IS | 25.11.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/51] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
MT | 25.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.07.2012 | |
IS | 25.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1310226 (PELZ & CO KG W [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] *; | [A]EP1106723 (FORT JAMES FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033] *; | [A]US2007098768 (CLOSE KENNETH B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] *; | [A]WO9417235 (KAYSERSBERG SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 3 - page 5 *; | [A]EP0819393 (IND CARTARIE TRONCHETTI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 13 * | by applicant | WO0142548 | EP0681621 |