EP2058539 - Sealing device, in particular with a built-in magnetic encoder, comprising a magnetic sealing lip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNR Roulements 1, Rue des Usines 74000 Annecy / FR | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nantua, René Le Crêt 466, route de Clermont / FR | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian STRATO-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/20] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP BL 57 - 14, rue Solleillet 75020 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08291035.7 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | FR20070007890 | 09.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0707890 | [2009/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2058539 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2058539 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/52, F16C33/78, F16J15/32, G01P3/44 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G01P3/443 (EP);
F16C33/7879 (EP);
F16C41/007 (EP);
F16J15/326 (EP);
G01P3/487 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | Dichtungsvorrichtung, insbesondere mit integriertem magnetischem Kodierer, die eine magnetische Dichtlippe umfasst | [2009/20] | English: | Sealing device, in particular with a built-in magnetic encoder, comprising a magnetic sealing lip | [2009/20] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité, notamment à codeur magnétique intégré, comprenant une lèvre d'étanchéité magnétique | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1806523 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE]) [X] 1-2,6-10 * abstract * * column 3, lines 37-40 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3-5,11-19; | [Y]DE19644744 (FAG AUTOMOBILTECHNIK AG [DE]) [Y] 3-5,11-19 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006097072 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]; HEIM JENS [DE]; HAMILTON JON [CA]) [X] 1-4,6,8-9,11,13-16,19 * page 7, lines 5-12 * * figures 5,6a,6b *; | [X]EP1164318 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]; KOYO SEALING TECHNO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-9,11 * abstract *; | [X]DE102004044118 (FAG KUGELFISCHER AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-9,11 * paragraph [0026]; figure 7 * |